U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00317
  • Case Name: Brooks v. Walmart, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 03, 2022: [Stipulation]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • February 16, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 10, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice of Consent]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 08, 2021: [Status Report]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 14, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Order]
  • January 12, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 12, 2021: [Status Report]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • December 14, 2020: [Protective Order]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Order]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • November 05, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 03, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 20, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • October 16, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.