U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00087
  • Case Name: Givan v. Henley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [USCA Order]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 07, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [USCA Order]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • March 09, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • March 03, 2021: [Mail Returned]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • February 25, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 24, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • February 24, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 11, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 11, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 10, 2021: [Mail Returned]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Order]
  • January 26, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 13, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 12, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • November 04, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 04, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 22, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 19, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 19, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.