U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00088
  • Case Name: Demarr v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • December 21, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 14, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Social Security Briefing Schedule Order]
  • March 31, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • March 31, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for RR]
  • October 20, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 20, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.