U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00323
  • Case Name: Samp v. Tegna Broadcast Holdings, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Status Conference]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • May 21, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • December 18, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order]
  • December 09, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • December 09, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 09, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 03, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Order]
  • November 25, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 09, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • October 22, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • October 21, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • October 21, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • October 20, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 20, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.