U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00326
  • Case Name: Bell v. City of Des Moines, Iowa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 08, 2021: [Dismiss]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice - Other]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • September 17, 2021: [Status Conference]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 28, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 27, 2021: [Status Report]
  • July 09, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 06, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 01, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 16, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [Status Report]
  • June 04, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • June 04, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 30, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • March 29, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Order]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • February 09, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 03, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 13, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 23, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.