U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00329
  • Case Name: Bensley v. Pate et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order]
  • January 04, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 04, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 23, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 23, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.