U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00090
  • Case Name: Andrus v. American United Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 25, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • May 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 06, 2022: [Status Report]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • April 06, 2022: [Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • October 08, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 06, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 01, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 03, 2021: [Stay]
  • August 02, 2021: [Stay]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • February 10, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 13, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • November 09, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 09, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • November 06, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 03, 2020: [Statement]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 26, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.