U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00330
  • Case Name: landacre v. mechanical systems, inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 24, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Order]
  • December 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 10, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 10, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 02, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order]
  • November 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 02, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.