U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cv-04016
  • Case Name: MicroSource, LLC et al v. Eco World Group, LLC et al--SEE STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL AT #102 AND #103
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Sealed Motion Access to Selected Parties]
  • March 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2022: [Seal]
  • March 23, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 18, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • March 15, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 14, 2022: [Seal]
  • March 12, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • March 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 18, 2022: [Sealed Motion Access to Selected Parties]
  • February 18, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • February 18, 2022: [In Limine]
  • February 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • October 25, 2021: [Expedite]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • August 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • July 20, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 12, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • November 12, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 12, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • November 12, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • November 10, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.