U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-03045
  • Case Name: McDonald et al v. Origen Embryo Technologies, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 24, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Protective Order]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 01, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 04, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.