U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00105
  • Case Name: Iowa Laborers' District Council Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. C. Cox Concrete, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Certificate]
  • August 03, 2022: [Writ of Garnishment]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Writ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment (Sealed)]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • June 14, 2022: [Writ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Writ]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Writ Returned]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • October 27, 2021: [Writ]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice - Other]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Disbursement of Funds]
  • April 20, 2021: [Disbursement of Funds]
  • April 13, 2021: [Bond]
  • April 13, 2021: [Release of Funds]
  • April 06, 2021: [Release of Funds]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment (Sealed)]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Sealed Document]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • January 11, 2021: [Writ Returned]
  • January 11, 2021: [Show Cause]
  • January 08, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 08, 2021: [Writ Issued]
  • January 07, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 07, 2021: [Writ]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • November 18, 2020: [Continue]
  • November 17, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 17, 2020: [Continue]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order]
  • November 02, 2020: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.