U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00338
  • Case Name: Young v. Cownie
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 17, 2021: [Reopen Case]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Reopen Case]
  • January 11, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 24, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 24, 2020: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • November 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2020: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • November 02, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 02, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.