U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00339
  • Case Name: Crowdis v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 24, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • November 10, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 09, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 09, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • November 06, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • November 05, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 03, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.