U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00083
  • Case Name: Casey v Does
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2021: [Strike]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 26, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • May 25, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 18, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order]
  • May 13, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 03, 2021: [Reply]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2021: [Claim]
  • April 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 07, 2021: [Strike]
  • April 05, 2021: [Complaint]
  • April 02, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 02, 2021: [Notice - Other]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 29, 2021: [Default Judgment]
  • March 29, 2021: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 19, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • February 17, 2021: [Leave]
  • February 17, 2021: [Reply]
  • February 17, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • February 12, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 12, 2021: [Leave]
  • February 11, 2021: [Reply]
  • February 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 10, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 08, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 05, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 02, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 02, 2021: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Reply]
  • January 28, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • January 27, 2021: [Leave]
  • January 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 21, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 20, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 20, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • January 20, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 08, 2021: [Default Judgment]
  • January 07, 2021: [Set Aside Default Entry]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • November 03, 2020: [Certificate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.