U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00280
  • Case Name: Skoog v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 20, 2021: [Stipulation]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 17, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • December 17, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 17, 2020: [Settlement Conference]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order]
  • November 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 05, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • November 04, 2020: [Order]
  • November 04, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.