U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00341
  • Case Name: Rachuy v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 27, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • October 08, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • October 08, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 08, 2021: [Settlement Conference]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 11, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Status Report]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Status Report]
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [Status Report]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 02, 2021: [Status Conference]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 03, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 03, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order]
  • January 29, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 29, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 26, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • January 06, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • January 06, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 11, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • December 03, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 05, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • November 04, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • November 04, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.