U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00385
  • Case Name: Darland v. CBE Companies Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Judgment]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order]
  • January 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 19, 2021: [Default Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Statement]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • November 23, 2020: [Status Report]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order]
  • November 06, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 06, 2020: [Errata]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.