U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00035
  • Case Name: Perry v. Richardson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 01, 2021: [Stipulation]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Order]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • December 22, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 22, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 22, 2020: [Consolidate Cases]
  • December 22, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 15, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 11, 2020: [Continue]
  • December 10, 2020: [Continue]
  • December 10, 2020: [Consolidate Cases]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order]
  • December 09, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 09, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 01, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 10, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • November 08, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.