U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00343
  • Case Name: Wolodkewitsch v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
  • October 19, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 08, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 07, 2021: [Remand]
  • September 01, 2021: [Brief /Other]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 12, 2021: [Remand]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • June 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • March 31, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
February, 2021
  • February 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 13, 2021: [Errata]
  • February 12, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order]
  • February 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 10, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • November 09, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.