U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00091
  • Case Name: Thomas v. Manpower, Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 26, 2021: [Reply]
  • January 26, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 26, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 25, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 23, 2021: [Order]
  • January 23, 2021: [Stay]
  • January 21, 2021: [Stay]
  • January 15, 2021: [Strike]
  • January 14, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 08, 2021: [Reply]
  • January 04, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 14, 2020: [Dismiss]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 17, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • November 10, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 10, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.