U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00348
  • Case Name: Hall v. Whitzell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 09, 2021: [Reopen Case]
  • December 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 09, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Reopen Case]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 11, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 11, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 12, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 12, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 30, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 30, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 30, 2021: [TRO]
  • March 22, 2021: [Notice - Other]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Temporary Restraining Order]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 12, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 12, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.