U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00346
  • Case Name: Hernandez v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • May 12, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • April 09, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Letter]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order]
  • November 30, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 12, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.