U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00245
  • Case Name: Ali v. Polk County Sheriff's Office
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [USCA Order]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 07, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • February 09, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 08, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • February 05, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 12, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.