U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00003
  • Case Name: Raybna, LLC et al v. Jersey Mike's Franchise Systems, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 02, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2022: [Vacate]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Reply]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 23, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 23, 2022: [Reply]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 07, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 16, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 15, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 10, 2022: [Vacate]
  • August 08, 2022: [Status Report]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Status Report]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Status Report]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 07, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 01, 2021: [Status Report]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Status Report]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Status Report Order]
  • November 12, 2020: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.