U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00350
  • Case Name: Williams v. State of Iowa
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • November 30, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 23, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order]
  • November 20, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 13, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 12, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 12, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 12, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 12, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.