U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00092
  • Case Name: Marken v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., et al.,
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 08, 2021: [Brief /Other]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • December 22, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 10, 2020: [Certificate]
  • December 10, 2020: [Stay]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 24, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 18, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 17, 2020: [Notice to Attorneys/Pro Se Party (inter-district transfer in)]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order]
  • November 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 13, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 13, 2020: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.