U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00354
  • Case Name: Dembry v. U.S. Probation Office et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • February 25, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 23, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • February 12, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 09, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 08, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 03, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 16, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.