U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00355
  • Case Name: Tyson v. Rose
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Letter]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Letter]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Letter]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Letter]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Letter]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 22, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 15, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 04, 2021: [Letter]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • February 24, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
  • February 03, 2021: [Notice - Other]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 10, 2020: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • December 03, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • December 03, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 02, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 20, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 19, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
  • November 16, 2020: [Certification of Inmate Account]
  • November 16, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.