U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-01015
  • Case Name: Design Basics, LLC et al v. Spahn & Rose Lumber Co
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Set Aside/Reconsider Order]
February, 2021
  • February 15, 2021: [Continue Trial]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 16, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.