U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:19-cv-02070
  • Case Name: Jesski et al v. Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation et al--SEE #22 STIP OF DISMISSAL AND #52, #59, #64 ORDERS AT FINAL ENTRY
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 01, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 01, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • April 01, 2021: [Compel]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Strike]
  • January 25, 2021: [Compel]
  • January 25, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • January 14, 2021: [Strike]
  • January 12, 2021: [Compel]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.