U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00352
  • Case Name: Matousek et al v. MidAmerican Energy Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [USCA Order]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [USCA Order]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Documents Sent]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • August 06, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 05, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 30, 2021: [Transcript]
  • July 06, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 26, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 08, 2021: [Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order]
  • April 26, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 11, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 04, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 04, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 07, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.