U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00357
  • Case Name: Nelson v. College Chefs, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • March 24, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • March 24, 2021: [Settlement Conference]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Order]
  • February 24, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 24, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • January 06, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 02, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 01, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 19, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • November 17, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.