U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00214
  • Case Name: D&M Roofing and Siding, Inc. v. Kool Storage, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 18, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • June 01, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • June 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Status Report]
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 11, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • May 10, 2021: [Errata]
  • May 10, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 09, 2021: [Status Report]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • November 20, 2020: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.