U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00360
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Child Pornography, Electronic Equipment, Computer Media seized from JMB on January 24, 2018
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Default Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Default Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • July 20, 2021: [Default Entry by Clerk]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Status Report]
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • June 22, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Writ Returned]
  • December 09, 2020: [Writ Issued]
  • December 08, 2020: [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 20, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.