U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00359
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Four (4) Firearms and Ammunition
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Judgment - Default]
  • February 25, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • February 24, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • February 23, 2022: [Default Entry by Clerk]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice - Other]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Writ Returned]
  • December 09, 2020: [Writ Issued]
  • December 08, 2020: [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.