U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00027
  • Case Name: Grove v. Beer Barn Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 26, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • September 08, 2022: [Closing Documents]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Certify Class]
  • December 09, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 09, 2021: [Settlement/Settlement Conference]
  • December 01, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • December 01, 2021: [Settlement/Settlement Conference]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 18, 2021: [Settlement Conference]
  • November 18, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 22, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order]
  • October 21, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 21, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • October 21, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • October 19, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • October 13, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 12, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 05, 2021: [Certify Class]
  • October 05, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 23, 2021: [Seal]
  • September 23, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 15, 2021: [Errata]
  • September 14, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • August 10, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice - Other]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Compel]
  • June 15, 2021: [Status Report]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • June 09, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order]
  • June 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • May 27, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 25, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
  • May 21, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 17, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • May 07, 2021: [Errata]
  • May 07, 2021: [Compel]
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice - Other]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Certify Class]
  • April 21, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • April 21, 2021: [Strike]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Reply]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • December 28, 2020: [Strike]
  • December 24, 2020: [Reply]
  • December 17, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 03, 2020: [Declaration]
  • December 03, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • December 03, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • December 02, 2020: [Notice - Other]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • November 20, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.