U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00361
  • Case Name: McBeth v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • January 14, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 02, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 05, 2021: [Remand]
  • October 01, 2021: [Brief /Other]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Remand]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 25, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • June 23, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 08, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 07, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 20, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.