U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00023
  • Case Name: Becker v. Linn County, Iowa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 05, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • September 28, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • September 20, 2021: [Extension of Time]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 30, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 19, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • March 16, 2021: [Continue Trial]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.