U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00095
  • Case Name: Grace Technologies, Inc. v. Haberkern
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 10, 2021: [Errata]
  • May 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 06, 2021: [Status Report]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Order]
  • March 16, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 11, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 11, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 08, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • December 01, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 24, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 24, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • November 24, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • November 23, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • November 23, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • November 23, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.