U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00362
  • Case Name: Mastin v. Navistar, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 03, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • April 22, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 29, 2021: [Dismiss]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Stay]
  • February 04, 2021: [Stay]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 05, 2021: [Reply]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 16, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • December 14, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • December 14, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • December 14, 2020: [Objections - Generic]
  • December 10, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 10, 2020: [Strike]
  • December 07, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Strike]
  • November 25, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 24, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 23, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 23, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • November 23, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.