U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00363
  • Case Name: Wiley v. Screening Reports, Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 24, 2022: [Stipulation]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • April 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • March 15, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • January 25, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • January 24, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 19, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 05, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 01, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • December 01, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • December 01, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 29, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Status Conference]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • February 24, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • February 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 16, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 10, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 03, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order]
  • February 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 01, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • February 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 20, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • January 19, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • November 25, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 25, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • November 24, 2020: [Errata]
  • November 24, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.