U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00152
  • Case Name: Reed et al v. Ag Manufacturing & Technology, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • September 20, 2021: [Status Report]
  • September 13, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 13, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 08, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • July 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • July 29, 2021: [Settlement Conference]
  • July 01, 2021: [Settlement/Settlement Conference]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Settlement/Settlement Conference]
  • June 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 11, 2021: [Status Report]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 24, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 24, 2020: [Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.