U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00096
  • Case Name: O'Flaherty et al v. Discover Student Loan et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 22, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 01, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 24, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 24, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.