U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00365
  • Case Name: Doss v. Drug Maker of Risperdall
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 11, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Brief /Other]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order]
  • June 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Letter]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 07, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order]
  • December 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 30, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.