U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00364
  • Case Name: Miller v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Compel]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Stay]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Stay]
  • December 28, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 23, 2020: [Reply]
  • December 21, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 21, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 02, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • December 01, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Compel]
  • November 30, 2020: [Certificate]
  • November 30, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.