U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:20-cv-02006
  • Case Name: Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. HP Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 06, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 06, 2022: [Exclude]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 12, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • January 25, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.