U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00366
  • Case Name: Wadley et al v. University of Iowa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 28, 2022: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • December 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 09, 2022: [Reply]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 02, 2022: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • December 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 01, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Status Report]
  • November 28, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • November 23, 2022: [Status Report]
  • November 22, 2022: [Reply]
  • November 22, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • November 22, 2022: [Quash]
  • November 22, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 02, 2022: [Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • October 31, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 27, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • October 26, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 25, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • October 21, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 21, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 21, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 20, 2022: [Compel]
  • October 19, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 18, 2022: [Status Report]
  • October 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 12, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • October 11, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • October 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 10, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 07, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • October 07, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 07, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 07, 2022: [Transcript]
  • October 06, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 06, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • October 05, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 05, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 04, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 04, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 03, 2022: [Compel]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 29, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 29, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • September 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 28, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • September 27, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 22, 2022: [Transcript]
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 20, 2022: [Status Report]
  • September 20, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 19, 2022: [Status Report]
  • September 15, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 14, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 13, 2022: [Stay]
  • September 13, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 13, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • September 12, 2022: [Leave to File]
  • September 12, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 12, 2022: [Leave]
  • September 07, 2022: [Transcript]
  • September 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 06, 2022: [Errata]
  • September 02, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 02, 2022: [Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 19, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 19, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • August 18, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • August 18, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 18, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 18, 2022: [Seal]
  • August 17, 2022: [Add Party]
  • August 17, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 16, 2022: [Status Report]
  • August 16, 2022: [Seal]
  • August 16, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Compel]
  • June 13, 2022: [Status Report]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Transcript]
  • May 05, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • April 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 25, 2022: [Status Report]
  • April 22, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 08, 2022: [Add Party]
  • April 08, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 15, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • March 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice - Other]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 21, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 18, 2022: [Reply]
  • February 15, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 11, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 10, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 09, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Compel]
  • January 27, 2022: [Compel]
  • January 05, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 14, 2021: [Status Report]
November, 2021
  • November 11, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 15, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 15, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 12, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 12, 2021: [Compel]
  • October 12, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Quash]
  • October 06, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 04, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 01, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 23, 2021: [Quash]
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 16, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • September 15, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice - Other]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order]
  • May 26, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 26, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 21, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 19, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 15, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • March 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 13, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 12, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 11, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 14, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 14, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • December 14, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 11, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 11, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 10, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • December 01, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 01, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • December 01, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.