U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00368
  • Case Name: Currie v. Guthrie County State Bank
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 07, 2021: [Stipulation]
August, 2021
  • August 07, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • August 06, 2021: [Settlement Conference]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 08, 2021: [Sealed Document]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Notice - Other]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Protective Order]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order]
  • January 29, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 29, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 29, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 19, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Errata]
  • December 30, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 30, 2020: [Order]
  • December 29, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 18, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 04, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 02, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • December 02, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.