U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00097
  • Case Name: Richardson et al v. Sigma Lambda Gamma National Sorority, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Reply]
  • April 06, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 23, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 11, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2021: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 02, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.