U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00371
  • Case Name: Mayorga v. Marsden Building Maintenance LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Transcript]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Costs Taxed]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • March 29, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 25, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 10, 2022: [Bill of Costs]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 24, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 22, 2022: [In Limine]
  • February 08, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 20, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 20, 2022: [Errata]
  • January 18, 2022: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • January 13, 2022: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Reply]
  • December 13, 2021: [Reply]
  • December 13, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Compel]
  • October 26, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 12, 2021: [Errata]
  • October 08, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Compel]
  • September 14, 2021: [Status Report]
  • September 13, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • July 12, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • July 12, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • July 08, 2021: [Status Report]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Status Report]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 10, 2021: [Status Report]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order]
  • January 13, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 13, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 11, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order]
  • December 11, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 11, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • December 11, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • December 07, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 04, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.